Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lambertus van Kessel, S.M.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sintang, Indonesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1912Born
12 Feb 193926.4Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Company of Mary
4 Jun 194835.7AppointedPrefect of Sintang, Indonesia
16 May 196148.6AppointedBishop of Sintang, Indonesia
15 Aug 196148.9Ordained BishopBishop of Sintang, Indonesia
25 May 197360.7ResignedBishop of Sintang, Indonesia
7 Nov 198068.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Sintang, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Lambertus van Kessel
Bishop Lambertus van Kessel S.M.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sintang

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVlijmen, Netherlands

  • a priest for 41.7 years
  • a bishop for 19.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast