Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco José Bruls Canisius, S.M.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Villavicencio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1897BornHulsberg, Netherlands
14 Jun 192426.6Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Company of Mary
7 Jan 193941.1AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Los Llanos de San Martín (Piani di San Martino), Colombia
7 Jan 193941.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Paraetonium
1 May 193941.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Paraetonium
27 Jun 193941.6SucceededVicar Apostolic of Los Llanos de San Martín (Piani di San Martino), Colombia
11 Feb 196466.2AppointedBishop of Villavicencio, Colombia
26 Apr 196971.4ResignedBishop of Villavicencio, Colombia
26 Apr 196971.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Tragurium
7 Jan 197678.1ResignedTitular Bishop of Tragurium
7 Sep 198890.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Villavicencio, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Francisco José Bruls Canisius:
Bishop Francisco José Bruls Canisius S.M.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Villavicencio

  • a priest for 64.2 years
  • a bishop for 49.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1939, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015