Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Huánuco

Dioecesis Huanucensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 17 March 1865
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Huancayo
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Peru
  • Square Kilometers: 44,000 (16,995 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Obispado, Jiron Damaso Beraun 741, Apartado 280, Huanuco, Peru
  • Telephone: (62)51.29.87
  • Fax: 51.19.85

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
17 March 1865ErectedArchdiocese of Lima Diocese of Huánuco (erected)
5 February 1900Territory LostDiocese of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga)
Diocese of Huánuco
Prefecture Apostolic of Ucayali (erected)
18 December 1944Territory LostDiocese of Huánuco Diocese of Huancayo (erected)
15 May 1958Territory LostDiocese of Huancayo
Diocese of Huánuco
Territorial Prelature of Tarma (erected)
15 May 1958Territory LostDiocese of Huánuco
Diocese of Huaraz
Territorial Prelature of Huarí (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1950405,500407,10099.6%4915646,335194834ap1951
1966280,000330,70384.7%2218407,000184840ap1967
1970405,900410,68098.8%5610666,150164224ap1971
1976420,000440,00095.5%2193014,000168025ap1977
1980462,000499,00092.6%14132717,111213425ap1981
1990589,000594,00099.2%19203915,102284229ap1991
1999622,500707,32588.0%17274414,1471463826ap2000
2000622,930707,74088.0%20274713,2531434927ap2001
2001645,930710,25090.9%19264514,3541476430ap2002
2002668,930712,76093.9%22234514,8658466431ap2003
2003720,407800,45390.0%24254914,7028336934ap2004
2004740,523822,80490.0%24265014,81011397133ap2005
2006761,000893,00085.2%29265513,83613317034ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 29 May 2013