Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Otoniel Alcedo Culquicóndor, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Ayacucho o Huamanga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jul 1914BornAyabaca
26 Nov 193925.3Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
17 Feb 195338.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chachapoyas, Peru
17 Feb 195338.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Forma
26 Apr 195338.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Forma
28 Aug 195844.1AppointedBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru
30 Jun 196651.9AppointedArchbishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga, Peru
20 Nov 197965.3ResignedArchbishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga, Peru
20 Jun 199782.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Ayacucho o Huamanga, Peru

MicroData Summary for Otoniel Alcedo Culquicóndor:
Archbishop Otoniel Alcedo Culquicóndor S.D.B. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Ayacucho o Huamanga

  • a priest for 57.5 years
  • a bishop for 44.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015