Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ivan Borzatti de L÷wenstern

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Zadar (Zara), Croatia

Titular Bishop of Milevum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1851Born
20 Sep 187322.6Ordained PriestPriest of Zadar (Zara), Croatia
15 Mar 190756.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia
15 Mar 190756.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Milevum
19 Mar 190756.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Milevum
191361.9ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia
17 Feb 192675.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Zadar (Zara), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Ivan Borzatti de L÷wenstern
Bishop Ivan Borzatti de L÷wenstern (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Zadar (Zara)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArbe

  • a priest for 52.4 years
  • a bishop for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,921
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,927
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1,907, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast