Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Rosario Farrugia

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Malta

Titular Bishop of Hamatha


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Aug 1836BornCaccia [Xaghra]
17 Dec 185923.3Ordained PriestPriest of Malta
3 Jun 190770.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Malta
3 Jun 190770.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Hamatha
7 Jul 190770.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hamatha
21 Dec 190771.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Malta

MicroData Summary for Paolo Rosario Farrugia:
Bishop Paolo Rosario Farrugia (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Malta

  • a priest for 48.0 years
  • a bishop for .5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 50
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1907, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013