Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juozapas Pletkus

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Telšiai, Lithuania

Titular Bishop of Tubia

Prelate of Klaipeda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 May 1895Born
5 May 192125.9Ordained PriestPriest
8 Nov 196772.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Telšiai, Lithuania
8 Nov 196772.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Tubia
8 Nov 196772.4AppointedPrelate of Klaipeda, Lithuania
25 Feb 196872.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tubia
29 Sep 197580.3DiedApostolic Administrator of Telšiai, Lithuania

MicroData Summary for Juozapas Pletkus
Bishop Juozapas Pletkus (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Telšiai

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGujenai

  • a priest for 54.3 years
  • a bishop for 7.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast