Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vilhelms Toms Marija Lapelis, O.P.

Bishop Emeritus of Liepāja, Latvia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Dec 1961 Born
1 Jun 198624.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
25 Jan 200038.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Liepāja, Latvia
25 Mar 200038.2Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Liepāja, Latvia
12 May 200139.3SucceededBishop of Liepāja, Latvia
20 Jun 201250.4ResignedBishop of Liepāja, Latvia

MicroData Summary for Vilhelms Toms Marija Lapelis
Bishop Vilhelms Toms Marija Lapelis O.P. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Liepāja

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDaugavpils

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Liepāja.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Number 13,727
  • r: Bollettino, 20 Jun 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018