Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Liudas Povilonis, M.I.C. †

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Kaunas

Titular Archbishop of Arcavica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1910BornMikieriai par. Simonys
29 Jun 193423.8Ordained PriestPriest
7 Nov 196959.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Telšiai (-Klaipeda), Lithuania
7 Nov 196959.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Arcavica
21 Dec 196959.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arcavica
7 Jul 197362.8AppointedCoadjutor Apostolic Administrator of Kaunas, Lithuania
7 Jul 197362.8AppointedCoadjutor Apostolic Administrator of Vilkaviškis, Lithuania
28 May 197968.7SucceededApostolic Administrator of Kaunas, Lithuania
28 May 197968.7SucceededApostolic Administrator of Vilkaviškis, Lithuania
16 Nov 198474.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Arcavica
27 Apr 198877.6RetiredApostolic Administrator of Kaunas, Lithuania
27 Apr 198877.6RetiredApostolic Administrator of Vilkaviškis, Lithuania
9 Aug 199079.9DiedApostolic Administrator Emeritus of Kaunas, Lithuania

MicroData Summary for Liudas Povilonis:
Archbishop Liudas Povilonis M.I.C. (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Kaunas

  • a priest for 56.1 years
  • a bishop for 20.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015