Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Cipriano Urgel y Villahermosa

Deceased

Archbishop of Palo, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1918Born
17 Mar 194526.4Ordained PriestPriest of Palo, Philippines
22 Mar 196243.4AppointedBishop of Calbayog, Philippines
12 Jun 196243.7Ordained BishopBishop of Calbayog, Philippines
12 Apr 197354.5AppointedBishop of Palo, Philippines
15 Nov 198264.1AppointedArchbishop of Palo, Philippines
22 Apr 198566.5DiedArchbishop of Palo, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Cipriano Urgel y Villahermosa
Archbishop Cipriano Urgel y Villahermosa (born , died ) Archbishop of Palo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHindang

  • a priest for 40.0 years
  • a bishop for 22.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 75

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast