Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Calbayog

Dioecesis Calbayogana



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 10 April 1910
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Palo
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Philippines
  • Square Kilometers: 5,591 (2,159 Square Miles)
  • Description: Western Samar
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, P.O. Box 2, J.D. Avelino St., Calbayog City, 6710 Western Samar, Philippines
  • Telephone: (055)209-1372
  • Fax: 209-3012

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
10 April 1910ErectedDiocese of Cebu (Provinces of Samar and Leyte) Diocese of Calbayog (erected)
28 April 1934Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Calbayog (from Manila)
28 November 1937Territory LostDiocese of Calbayog (Leyte) Diocese of Palo (erected)
22 October 1960Territory LostDiocese of Calbayog Diocese of Borongan (erected)
5 December 1974Territory LostDiocese of Borongan
Diocese of Calbayog
Diocese of Catarman (erected)
15 November 1982Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Calbayog (from Cebu)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1950751,100758,30099.1%515114,7271837ap1951
1958862,470898,48496.0%70128210,517154051ap1960
1970580,802601,06296.6%141441,485173032ap1971
1980451,000455,00099.1%3153612,52782025ap1981
1990623,000648,00096.1%2943318,87843927ap1991
1999540,190563,70395.8%4685410,003494927ap2000
2000628,882661,98195.0%4184912,834414626ap2001
2001609,068641,12495.0%4885610,876304526ap2002
2002620,153652,79295.0%4485211,926294226ap2003
2003631,439664,67395.0%4685411,693394026ap2004
2004642,931676,77095.0%4865411,906434626ap2005
2006668,000702,00095.2%5786510,276403827ap2007
2013752,000789,00095.3%688769,894473332ap2014
2016731,542770,04595.0%729819,031603234ap2017

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_d, v3.2.2, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 28 Apr 2018

Quantcast