Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ricardo Pido Tancinco

Bishop Emeritus of Calbayog, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Aug 1933 Born
30 Nov 195623.3Ordained PriestPriest of Calbayog, Philippines
8 Mar 197440.5AppointedBishop of Calbayog, Philippines
30 May 197440.8Ordained BishopBishop of Calbayog, Philippines
21 Apr 197945.7ResignedBishop of Calbayog, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Ricardo Pido Tancinco
Bishop Ricardo Pido Tancinco (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Calbayog

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCalbayog

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Calbayog.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast