Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvador Trane Modesto

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of San Carlos

Titular Bishop of Margum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1930BornCarigara, Philippines
23 Mar 195828.0Ordained PriestPriest
28 Dec 197848.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Dumaguete, Philippines
28 Dec 197848.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Margum
3 May 197949.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Margum
30 Mar 198757.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Carlos, Philippines
25 Jul 200575.3RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of San Carlos, Philippines
11 Oct 201585.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of San Carlos, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Salvador Trane Modesto:
Bishop Salvador Trane Modesto (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of San Carlos

  • a priest for 57.5 years
  • a bishop for 36.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Jul 2005
  • mn: CB, 23 Jul 2015
  • d: CB, 14 Oct 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015