Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stephanus Tri Buu Thiên

Bishop of Cần Thơ, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1950 Born
22 Jul 198737.4Ordained PriestPriest of Cần Thơ, Viet Nam
26 Nov 200252.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Cần Thơ, Viet Nam
18 Feb 200353.0Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Cần Thơ, Viet Nam
17 Oct 201060.6SucceededBishop of Cần Thơ, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Stephanus Tri Buu Thiên
Bishop Stephanus Tri Buu Thiên (born ) Bishop of Cần Thơ

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTra Long

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Cần Thơ.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • s: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 170, Number 14,329

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast