Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Nguyên Van Nho

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop of Nha Trang, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1937Born
21 Dec 196730.9Ordained PriestPriest
21 Apr 199760.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Nha Trang, Viet Nam
18 Jun 199760.3Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Nha Trang, Viet Nam
21 May 200366.3DiedCoadjutor Bishop of Nha Trang, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Pierre Nguyên Van Nho
Bishop Pierre Nguyên Van Nho (born , died ) Coadjutor Bishop of Nha Trang

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVo Canh

  • a priest for 35.4 years
  • a bishop for 5.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 13,017
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast