Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Mendi

Dioecesis Mendiensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Donald Francis Lippert, O.F.M. Cap., Bishop

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Mendi
13 November 1958ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Port Moresby Prefecture Apostolic of Mendi (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Mendi
6 July 1965ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Mendi Vicariate Apostolic of Mendi
Diocese of Mendi
15 November 1966ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Mendi Diocese of Mendi
16 January 1971Territory LostDiocese of Bereina
Diocese of Mendi
Diocese of Kerema (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Mendi
197023,096235,0009.8%4283272134309ap1971
198044,906240,60018.7%232341,320524914ap1981
199062,740260,00024.1%322252,509385020ap1991
199981,002340,00023.8%522273,000395631ap2000
200088,365400,00022.1%318214,207336132ap2001
200192,712415,00022.3%323263,565446132ap2002
200269,688544,35212.8%322252,787336216ap2003
200370,794544,35213.0%319223,217315016ap2004
200471,832546,40013.1%519242,993294816ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 20 Sep 2013