Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul John Marx, M.S.C. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kerema, Papua New Guinea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1935Born
29 Jun 196328.2Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
3 May 198550.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Kerema, Papua New Guinea
13 Dec 198550.7Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Kerema, Papua New Guinea
6 Dec 198853.7SucceededBishop of Kerema, Papua New Guinea
13 Mar 201075.0RetiredBishop of Kerema, Papua New Guinea
19 Jun 201883.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Kerema, Papua New Guinea

MicroData Summary for Paul John Marx
Bishop Paul John Marx M.S.C. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kerema

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMutzig, France

  • a priest for 54.9 years
  • a bishop for 32.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 13 Mar 2010
  • d: CB, 20 Jun 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 18 Aug 2018

Quantcast