Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Marai

Bishop Emeritus of Goroka, Papua New Guinea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1948 Born
6 Dec 197628.9Ordained PriestPriest of Wewak, Papua New Guinea
25 Oct 198840.8AppointedBishop of Goroka, Papua New Guinea
23 Feb 198941.1Ordained BishopBishop of Goroka, Papua New Guinea
15 Nov 199446.8ResignedBishop of Goroka, Papua New Guinea

MicroData Summary for Michael Marai
Bishop Michael Marai (born 1948) Bishop Emeritus of Goroka

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMuschu Island

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Goroka.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,140
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Number 11,271

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 22 Jun 2018

Quantcast