Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luke Paul Matlatarea, M.S.C. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bereina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Dec 1938BornMalmal
10 Jan 197132.1Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
21 Jun 198849.5AppointedBishop of Bereina, Papua New Guinea
21 Sep 198849.8Ordained BishopBishop of Bereina, Papua New Guinea
28 Mar 199859.3DiedBishop of Bereina, Papua New Guinea

MicroData Summary for Luke Paul Matlatarea:
Bishop Luke Paul Matlatarea M.S.C. (born , died ) Bishop of Bereina

  • a priest for 27.2 years
  • a bishop for 9.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111, Number 9,815
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013