Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cesare Bonivento, P.I.M.E.

Bishop Emeritus of Vanimo, Papua New Guinea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1940 Born
26 Jun 196524.7Ordained PriestPriest of Pontifical Institute for Foreign Missions
21 Dec 199151.2AppointedBishop of Vanimo, Papua New Guinea
10 May 199251.6Ordained BishopBishop of Vanimo, Papua New Guinea
5 Feb 201877.3RetiredBishop of Vanimo, Papua New Guinea

MicroData Summary for Cesare Bonivento (VIAF: 89083839)
Bishop Cesare Bonivento P.I.M.E. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Vanimo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChioggia, Diocese of Chioggia, Italy
Ordained BishopCathedral, Alotau, Diocese of Alotau-Sideia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Vanimo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,773
  • r: Bollettino, 5 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast