Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stephen M. Tiru

Deceased

Bishop of Khunti, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1937Born
4 May 196931.4Ordained PriestPriest
18 Apr 198648.3AppointedBishop of Dumka, India
7 Oct 198648.8Ordained BishopBishop of Dumka, India
1 Apr 199557.3AppointedBishop of Khunti, India
3 Mar 201274.2DiedBishop of Khunti, India

MicroData Summary for Stephen M. Tiru
Bishop Stephen M. Tiru (born , died ) Bishop of Khunti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSardikal

  • a priest for 42.8 years
  • a bishop for 25.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 5 Mar 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast