Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Minj, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop of Gumla, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Oct 1932Born
25 Mar 196532.4Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
28 May 199360.6AppointedBishop of Gumla, India
22 Aug 199360.8Ordained BishopBishop of Gumla, India
15 Nov 200472.1DiedBishop of Gumla, India

MicroData Summary for Michael Minj
Bishop Michael Minj S.J. (born , died ) Bishop of Gumla

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGholeng

  • a priest for 39.6 years
  • a bishop for 11.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136, Number 12,166
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast