Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patras Minj, S.J.

Bishop of Ambikapur, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1944 Born
30 Apr 197732.3Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
5 Jul 199651.5AppointedBishop of Ambikapur, India
18 Oct 199651.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ambikapur, India

MicroData Summary for Patras Minj
Bishop Patras Minj S.J. (born ) Bishop of Ambikapur

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTapkara

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ambikapur.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Number 12,907

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast