Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Henshaw

Deceased

Bishop of Salford, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1873Born
18 Oct 189926.7Ordained PriestPriest of Salford, England, Great Britain
14 Dec 192552.8AppointedBishop of Salford, England, Great Britain
21 Dec 192552.8Ordained BishopBishop of Salford, England, Great Britain
23 Sep 193865.6DiedBishop of Salford, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Henshaw
Bishop Thomas Henshaw (born , died ) Bishop of Salford

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMiles Platting, Manchester, Lancashire, Diocese of Salford, England
Ordained PriestSt. Cuthbert, Seminary, Ushaw, Durham, County Durham, Diocese of Hexham and Newcastle, England
Ordained BishopSt. John the Evangelist, Cathedral, Salford, Lancashire, Diocese of Salford, England
Death PlaceWardley Hall, Worsley, Manchester, Lancashire, Diocese of Salford, England
Buried Place (Original)St. Mary, Cemetery, Worsley, Manchester, Lancashire, Diocese of Salford, England

  • a priest for 38.9 years
  • a bishop for 12.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1925, Number 62
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 120
  • loc: CL, 27 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast