Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas William Wilkinson

Deceased

Bishop of Hexham and Newcastle, England


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1825BornHarperley Park, County Durham
29 Dec 184621.7Converted
23 Dec 184823.7Ordained PriestPriest of Hexham, England, Great Britain
5 Jun 188863.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain
5 Jun 188863.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Cisamus
25 Jul 188863.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cisamus
28 Dec 188964.7AppointedBishop of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain
17 Apr 190984.0DiedBishop of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Thomas William Wilkinson:
Bishop Thomas William Wilkinson (born , died ) Bishop of Hexham and Newcastle

  • a priest for 60.3 years
  • a bishop for 20.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 205, and Page 297
  • b/c1: Arundel to Zabi, Page 215

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 13 Nov 2014