Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tony Neelankavil

Auxiliary Bishop of Trichur (Syro-Malabar), India

Titular Bishop of Masuccaba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1967 Born
27 Dec 199326.4Ordained PriestPriest of Trichur (Syro-Malabar), India
1 Sep 201750.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trichur (Syro-Malabar), India
1 Sep 201750.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Masuccaba
18 Nov 201750.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Masuccaba

MicroData Summary for Tony Neelankavil
Bishop Tony Neelankavil (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Trichur

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValappad, Eparchy of Trichur (Syro-Malabar)
Ordained BishopOur Lady of Lourdes, Cathedral, Trichur, Archdiocese of Trichur (Syro-Malabar)

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Trichur (Syro-Malabar).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Sep 2017
  • opd/c1: CB, 4 Sep 2017
  • ob: CB, 18 Sep 2017
  • c2+: CB, 22 Sep 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Number 19,605

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast