Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franco Mulakkal (Aippunny)

Bishop of Jullundur


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1964 BornMattam
21 Apr 199026.1Ordained PriestPriest of Jullundur, India
17 Jan 200944.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Delhi, India
17 Jan 200944.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Chullu
21 Feb 200944.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Chullu
13 Jun 201349.2AppointedBishop of Jullundur, India

MicroData Summary for Franco Mulakkal (Aippunny):
Bishop Franco Mulakkal (Aippunny) (born ) Bishop of Jullundur

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Jullundur.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Jan 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,055
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 Jun 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013