Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tito Buss

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Rio do Sul, Santa Catarina, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1925Born
8 Dec 195126.2Ordained PriestPriest
12 Mar 196943.5AppointedBishop of Rio do Sul, Santa Catarina, Brazil
3 Aug 196943.9Ordained BishopBishop of Rio do Sul, Santa Catarina, Brazil
30 Aug 200074.9RetiredBishop of Rio do Sul, Santa Catarina, Brazil
30 Apr 201387.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Rio do Sul, Santa Catarina, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Tito Buss (VIAF: 555150325563610090002)
Bishop Tito Buss (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Rio do Sul

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSão Ludgero
Ordained BishopSta. Catarina, Rio do Sul, Diocese of Rio do Sul, Santa Catarina

  • a priest for 61.3 years
  • a bishop for 43.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 1 May 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 5, Number 173
  • c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 7, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast