Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Julio César Terán Dutari, S.J.

Bishop Emeritus of Ibarra

Apostolic Administrator of Santo Domingo en Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1933 BornSoná, Panama
25 Jul 196329.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
12 Jul 199561.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Quito, Ecuador
12 Jul 199561.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Horrea
30 Sep 199562.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Horrea
14 Feb 200470.5AppointedBishop of Ibarra, Ecuador
25 Mar 201177.6RetiredBishop of Ibarra, Ecuador
15 Mar 201278.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Santo Domingo en Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Julio César Terán Dutari:
Bishop Julio César Terán Dutari S.J. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Ibarra

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ibarra.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Mar 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,615
  • ab: CB, 16 Mar 2012
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013