Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonio José Cardinal González Zumárraga

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Quito

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1925BornPujili
29 Jun 195126.3Ordained PriestPriest of Quito, Ecuador
17 May 196944.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Quito, Ecuador
17 May 196944.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Tagarata
15 Jun 196944.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tagarata
30 Jan 197852.9AppointedBishop of Machala, Ecuador
28 Jun 198055.3AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Quito, Ecuador
1 Jun 198560.2SucceededArchbishop of Quito, Ecuador
21 Feb 200175.9Elevated to Cardinal
21 Feb 200175.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via
25 Feb 200175.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via
21 Mar 200378.0RetiredArchbishop of Quito, Ecuador
13 Oct 200883.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Quito, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Antonio José González Zumárraga:
Cardinal Antonio José González Zumárraga (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Quito

  • a priest for 57.3 years
  • a bishop for 39.3 years
  • a cardinal for 7.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • i: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2001
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 138
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 18 Jan 2014