Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pablo Cardinal Muñoz Vega, S.J. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Quito

Cardinal-Priest of San Roberto Bellarmino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 May 1903BornMira
25 Jul 193330.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
7 Feb 196460.7AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Quito, Ecuador
7 Feb 196460.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Ceramus
19 Mar 196460.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ceramus
23 Jun 196764.1AppointedArchbishop of Quito, Ecuador
28 Apr 196965.9Elevated to Cardinal
28 Apr 196965.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Roberto Bellarmino
1 Jun 198582.0RetiredArchbishop of Quito, Ecuador
3 Jun 199491.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Quito, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Pablo Muñoz Vega:
Pablo Cardinal Muñoz Vega S.J. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Quito

  • a priest for 60.9 years
  • a bishop for 30.2 years
  • a cardinal for 25.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 138
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 18 Jun 2014