Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Portoviejo

Archidioecesis Portus Veteris



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 25 February 1994
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Ecuador
  • Square Kilometers: 20,342 (7,857 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://arquidiocesisdeportoviejo.org/
  • Mailing Address: Apartado 24, Av. da Universitaria s/n, entre Alajuela y Ramos y Duarte, Portoviejo, Manabi, Ecuador
  • Telephone: (05) 63.04.04; 63.24.06
  • Fax: 63.44.28

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Portoviejo (Porto Vecchio)
23 March 1870ErectedDiocese of Guayaquil
Archdiocese of Quito
Diocese of Portoviejo (Porto Vecchio) (erected)
14 December 1945Territory LostDiocese of Portoviejo (Porto Vecchio) Prefecture Apostolic of Esmeraldas (erected)
Archdiocese of Portoviejo
25 February 1994ElevatedDiocese of Portoviejo (Porto Vecchio) Archdiocese of Portoviejo

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Portoviejo (Porto Vecchio)
1950300,000384,00078.1%1318319,67781543ap1951
1965600,000620,00096.8%2933629,677348032ap1967
1968768,512.0%32417306015534ap1971
1975820,000880,00093.2%23345714,38544216542ap1981
1976800,000868,61592.1%29346312,69813513542ap1977
19901,100,0001,200,00091.7%36468213,41415417552ap1991
Archdiocese of Portoviejo
19991,100,0001,200,00091.7%554510011,0004924270ap2000
20001,100,0001,200,00091.7%27467315,0685425227ap2001
20011,100,0001,200,00091.7%76391159,5654625473ap2002
20021,100,0001,200,00091.7%614410510,4765026973ap2003
20031,104,2751,180,37593.6%69451149,6865825176ap2004
20041,091,1431,186,02592.0%70461169,4066027678ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 22 Apr 2014