Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Enrique Orellana Ricaurte, S.J. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Quito

Titular Bishop of Bennefa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1914BornQuito
15 Jul 194530.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
26 Jan 197863.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Guayaquil, Ecuador
26 Jan 197863.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Bennefa
9 Apr 197863.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bennefa
198671.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Quito, Ecuador
26 Nov 199480.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Quito, Ecuador
16 Dec 199783.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Quito, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Luis Enrique Orellana Ricaurte:
Bishop Luis Enrique Orellana Ricaurte S.J. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Quito

  • a priest for 52.4 years
  • a bishop for 19.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 138
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013