Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Santo Domingo en Ecuador

Dioecesis Sancti Dominici in Aequatoria



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 18 June 2008
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Portoviejo
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Ecuador
  • Square Kilometers: 8,500 (3,283 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesissd.com/
  • Mailing Address: Casa Bomboli, Calle German Maya 212, entre Mons. Shumacher y Jorge Iturralde, Urb. Santa Rosa, Santo Domingo de los Colorados, Pichincha, Ecuador
  • Telephone: (02)2750.935
  • Fax: 2750.715

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Territorial Prelature of Santo Domingo de los Colorados
5 January 1987ErectedArchdiocese of Quito Territorial Prelature of Santo Domingo de los Colorados (erected)
Diocese of Santo Domingo de los Colorados
8 August 1996ElevatedTerritorial Prelature of Santo Domingo de los Colorados Diocese of Santo Domingo de los Colorados
Diocese of Santo Domingo en Ecuador
18 June 2008Name ChangedDiocese of Santo Domingo de los Colorados Diocese of Santo Domingo en Ecuador

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Territorial Prelature of Santo Domingo de los Colorados
1990450,000480,00093.8%20163612,500233932ap1991
Diocese of Santo Domingo de los Colorados
1999575,000595,00096.6%32225410,6483339048ap2000
2000585,000600,00097.5%4545906,5003578448ap2001
2001585,000600,00097.5%4645916,4282578748ap2002
2002585,000650,00090.0%5145966,0932579350ap2003
2003585,000675,00086.7%4224668,86313310357ap2004
2004600,000700,00085.7%5127787,69213310557ap2005
Diocese of Santo Domingo en Ecuador
2008635,000741,00085.7%5035857,47023810058ap2009
2010653,000763,00085.6%4631778,48023110358ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 10 Jul 2013