Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pal Szmrecsányi

Deceased

Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1846Born
23 Jul 186923.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
25 Jul 186923.2Ordained PriestPriest
1 Dec 189145.5SelectedBishop of Spiš, Slovakia
17 Dec 189145.6ConfirmedBishop of Spiš, Slovakia
27 Mar 189245.9Ordained BishopBishop of Spiš, Slovakia
25 Jun 190357.1AppointedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
9 Aug 190862.2DiedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania

MicroData Summary for Pal Szmrecsányi (VIAF: 308720012)
Bishop Pal Szmrecsányi (born , died ) Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSarisské Dravce, Diocese of Košice, Slovakia
Ordained BishopEger, Archdiocese of Eger, Hungary

  • a priest for 39.0 years
  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 359, and Page 504
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1892, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 May 2017