Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antal Fetser

Deceased

Bishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1862Born
28 Jan 188523.0Ordained PriestPriest of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
21 Mar 190644.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
21 Mar 190644.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Palaeopolis in Asia
1 Apr 190644.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Palaeopolis in Asia
22 Jan 191553.0AppointedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
6 Oct 193371.7DiedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary

MicroData Summary for Antal Fetser
Bishop Antal Fetser (born , died ) Bishop of Győr (Raab)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNagy Karoly, Romania

  • a priest for 48.6 years
  • a bishop for 27.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1906, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast