Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Imrich Bende

Deceased

Bishop of Nitra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1824BornBaja, Hungary
31 Jul 184722.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
29 Aug 184723.0Ordained PriestPriest
8 Nov 188662.2SelectedBishop of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia
17 Mar 188762.6ConfirmedBishop of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia
24 Apr 188762.7Ordained BishopBishop of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia
19 Jan 189368.4AppointedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia
18 Mar 191186.6DiedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Imrich Bende:
Bishop Imrich Bende (born , died ) Bishop of Nitra

  • a priest for 63.6 years
  • a bishop for 23.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 408, and Page 416

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013