Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Felice Barlacci

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Narni


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1633¹BornRoma
24 May 168350.3AppointedBishop of Narni, Italy
30 May 168350.4Ordained BishopBishop of Narni, Italy
1 May 169057.3ResignedBishop of Narni, Italy
27 Nov 170875.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Narni, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Felice Barlacci:
Bishop Giuseppe Felice Barlacci (born 1633, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Narni

  • a bishop for 25.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 280
  • c34: CB, 1 Jun 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1683, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 28 Apr 2015