Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Maria Moles, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1638¹BornNapoli
1653¹15.0ProfessedMember of Congregation of Clerics Regular
10 Jan 168446.0AppointedBishop of Nola, Italy
16 Jan 168446.0Ordained BishopBishop of Nola, Italy
1695¹57.0ResignedBishop of Nola, Italy
12 May 169759.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Nola, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Maria Moles:
Bishop Francesco Maria Moles C.R. (born 1638, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nola

  • a bishop for 13.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 291
  • c34: CB, 1 Jun 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1684, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 21 Apr 2015