Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karl Heinz Jacoby

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Trier, Germany

Titular Bishop of Sulci


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1918Born
18 Dec 194830.3Ordained PriestPriest of Trier, Germany
3 May 196849.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany
3 May 196849.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Sulci
11 Jun 196849.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sulci
25 Oct 199375.2RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany
29 Jan 200586.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Trier, Germany

MicroData Summary for Karl Heinz Jacoby
Bishop Karl Heinz Jacoby (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Trier

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHolz-Saar

  • a priest for 56.1 years
  • a bishop for 36.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast