Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Grand Falls

Dioecesis Grandicataractensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Harbour Grace
29 February 1856ErectedDiocese of Newfoundland Diocese of Harbour Grace (erected)
13 July 1945Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Baie d’Hudson {Hudson Bay}
Vicariate Apostolic of Golfe St-Laurent
Diocese of Harbour Grace
Vicariate Apostolic of Labrador (erected)
Diocese of Harbour Grace-Grand Falls
22 February 1958Name ChangedDiocese of Harbour Grace Diocese of Harbour Grace-Grand Falls
Diocese of Grand Falls
30 October 1964Name ChangedDiocese of Harbour Grace-Grand Falls Diocese of Grand Falls

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Harbour Grace
195025,000145,00017.2%2833180647526ap1951
Diocese of Harbour Grace-Grand Falls
Diocese of Grand Falls
196633,375200,00016.7%32436927412527ap1967
197034,000189,00018.0%342369441843ap1971
197635,000200,00017.5%3636972147028ap1977
198035,300201,60017.5%31311,138147229ap1981
199031,638226,00014.0%27271,17135928ap1991
199930,74992,46433.3%27271,1382830ap2000
200029,431138,89821.2%27271,0903130ap2001
200129,269123,97923.6%28281,0453430ap2002
200229,069174,48816.7%281291,00213530ap2003
200329,030171,74216.9%29291,0013229ap2004
200436,774181,97820.2%29291,2682730ap2005
200637,200184,20020.2%28281,3282130ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 12 Jun 2013