Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jeremiah Joseph Coffey

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sale


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1933BornCork, Ireland
22 Jun 195825.4Ordained PriestPriest of Sale, Australia
8 Apr 198956.2AppointedBishop of Sale, Australia
30 Jun 198956.4Ordained BishopBishop of Sale, Australia
2 Jan 200875.0RetiredBishop of Sale, Australia
19 Nov 201481.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Sale, Australia

MicroData Summary for Jeremiah Joseph Coffey:
Bishop Jeremiah Joseph Coffey (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sale

  • a priest for 56.4 years
  • a bishop for 25.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 2 Jan 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 116, Number 10,353
  • d: CB, 19 Nov 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015