Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Nerbini

Bishop of Prato, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1954 Born
22 Apr 199540.8Ordained PriestPriest of Fiesole, Italy
15 May 201964.9AppointedBishop of Prato, Italy
30 Jun 201965.0Ordained BishopBishop of Prato, Italy
7 Sep 201965.2InstalledBishop of Prato, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Nerbini
Bishop Giovanni Nerbini (born ) Bishop of Prato

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFigline Valdarno, Diocese of Fiesole
Ordained BishopCathedral, Fiesole, Diocese of Fiesole

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Prato.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 May 2019
  • ob: CB, 22 May 2019
  • c2: CB, 10 Jun 2019
  • c2+: CB, 20 Jun 2019
  • c4: CB, 30 Jun 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 1 Jul 2019

Quantcast