Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel Marchesi

Bishop of Floresta, Pernambuco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1953 BornIncisa Valdarno, Italy
6 Jul 197824.8Ordained PriestPriest of Fiesole, Italy
21 Feb 201359.4AppointedBishop of Floresta, Pernambuco, Brazil
18 May 201359.7Ordained BishopBishop of Floresta, Pernambuco, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Marchesi:
Bishop Gabriel Marchesi (born ) Bishop of Floresta

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Floresta.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Feb 2013
  • ob: CB, 27 Feb 2013
  • c2+: CB, 25 Mar 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,787

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013