Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adalberto Domingos Marzi, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Alto Solimões, Amazonas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1922BornSpello, Italy
2 Feb 194724.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
8 Apr 195937.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Alto Solimões, Amazonas, Brazil
4 Feb 196138.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Saesina
4 Feb 196138.8AppointedPrelate of Alto Solimões, Amazonas, Brazil
9 Jul 196139.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Saesina
26 May 197856.1ResignedTitular Bishop of Saesina
12 Sep 199068.4RetiredPrelate of Alto Solimões, Amazonas, Brazil
18 Sep 200179.4DiedPrelate Emeritus of Alto Solimões, Amazonas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Adalberto Domingos Marzi:
Bishop Adalberto Domingos Marzi O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Alto Solimões

  • a priest for 54.6 years
  • a bishop for 40.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013