Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Samson Shukardin, O.F.M.

Bishop of Hyderabad in Pakistan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1961 Born
1991²29.9Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor
10 Dec 199332.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
16 Dec 201453.8AppointedBishop of Hyderabad in Pakistan
31 Jan 201554.0Ordained BishopBishop of Hyderabad in Pakistan

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Samson Shukardin
Bishop Samson Shukardin O.F.M. (born ) Bishop of Hyderabad in Pakistan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHyderbad

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Hyderabad in Pakistan.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Dec 2014
  • ob/c2+: CB, 31 Dec 2014
  • c2+: CB, 31 Jan 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Number 18,360

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast