Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Lawrence John Saldanha

Archbishop Emeritus of Lahore, Pakistan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jun 1936 Born
16 Jan 196023.5Ordained PriestPriest of Lahore, Pakistan
24 Apr 200164.8AppointedArchbishop of Lahore, Pakistan
11 Sep 200165.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lahore, Pakistan
7 Apr 201174.8RetiredArchbishop of Lahore, Pakistan

MicroData Summary for Lawrence John Saldanha
Archbishop Lawrence John Saldanha (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Lahore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMangalore

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Lahore.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 7 Apr 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 164, Number 14,044

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast