Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Oscar Sevrin, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Raigarh-Ambikapur, India

Titular Bishop of Mossyna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1884Born
1 Jul 191934.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
9 Apr 193449.3AppointedBishop of Ranchi, India
25 Jul 193449.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ranchi, India
13 Dec 195167.0AppointedBishop of Raigarh-Ambikapur, India
8 Nov 195772.9ResignedBishop of Raigarh-Ambikapur, India
8 Nov 195772.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Mossyna
1 May 197590.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Raigarh-Ambikapur, India

MicroData Summary for Oscar Sevrin
Bishop Oscar Sevrin S.J. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Raigarh-Ambikapur

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNeuville Wanne

  • a priest for 55.8 years
  • a bishop for 40.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1976
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1934, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast