Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emilio Antonio di Pasquo

Deceased

Bishop of Avellaneda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1899BornBuenos Aires
20 Dec 192424.9Ordained PriestPriest of Buenos Aires, Argentina
2 Nov 194646.8AppointedBishop of San Luis, Argentina
15 Dec 194646.9Ordained BishopBishop of San Luis, Argentina
25 Jan 194747.0InstalledBishop of San Luis, Argentina
12 Jun 196161.4AppointedBishop of Avellaneda, Argentina
15 Aug 196161.6InstalledBishop of Avellaneda, Argentina
9 Apr 196262.2DiedBishop of Avellaneda, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Emilio Antonio di Pasquo:
Bishop Emilio Antonio di Pasquo (born , died ) Bishop of Avellaneda

  • a priest for 37.3 years
  • a bishop for 15.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 110

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015