Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Štefan Sečka

Deceased

Bishop of Spiš, Slovakia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1953Born
6 Jun 197622.9Ordained PriestPriest of Spiš, Slovakia
28 Jun 200248.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Spiš, Slovakia
28 Jun 200248.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Sita
27 Jul 200249.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sita
4 Aug 201158.0AppointedBishop of Spiš, Slovakia
10 Sep 201158.1InstalledBishop of Spiš, Slovakia
28 Oct 202067.3DiedBishop of Spiš, Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Štefan Sečka
Bishop Štefan Sečka (born , died ) Bishop of Spiš

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSpišský Štvrtok
Ordained BishopSaint Martin, Cathedral, Spisské Podhradie
Death PlaceLevoča

  • a priest for 44.3 years
  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 Aug 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Number 14,235

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast